Global Patent Index - EP 1031701 A1

EP 1031701 A1 2000-08-30 - Swing door

Title (en)

Swing door

Title (de)

Schwenktüre

Title (fr)

Porte pivotante

Publication

EP 1031701 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102167 A

Priority

DE 19906283 A

Abstract (en)

The swivel door has two parallel horizontal arms (5) hinged on an upright support (2). A solid panel (8) is fitted between the arms and an end section (11) is fitted to the free ends of the arms to complete the door. The solid panel can be cut to size to cover different sizes of doors. The end section can be made of soft plastic to prevent injury e.g. when struck by children.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schwenktüre (1) für einen Personendurchgang, mit einem Türflügel (3), dessen Umrandung zwei horizontal angeordnete Abschnitte (5) aufweist, die wahlweise zum Tragen eines flächigen, zwischen den Abschnitten (5) angeordneten Teiles (8) bestimmt sind. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß sich an die Abschnitte (5) ein mit den Abschnitten (5) verbundenes Endstück (11) anschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 11/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906283 A1 20000817; EP 1031701 A1 20000830; EP 1031701 B1 20030507

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100208

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002033 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI