Global patent index - EP 1031703 A3

EP 1031703 A3 2000-09-13 - Operating arrangements for stator vanes

Title (en)

Operating arrangements for stator vanes

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtungen für Leitschaufeln

Title (fr)

Dispositifs de commande d'aubes directrices

Publication

EP 1031703 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00300999 A

Priority

GB 9904032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1031703A2] An operating arrangement for adjustable stator vanes (14) in a gas turbine engine comprises a control member (30) defining a plurality of apertures (32, 132) and a plurality of operating levers (24). Each operating lever (24) has a first end region (28) to be secured to the stator vane (14) and a second end region (36). A pin (34, 134) extends from the second end region (36) to be received in an associated aperture (32, 132) in the control member. Each pin (34, 134) and the respective aperture (32, 132) are movable longitudinally relative to each other. A laterally extending projection (41, 141) is provided on the pin (34) or on the wall (50) of the aperture (32, 132). The arrangement is such that relative pivotal and longitudinal movement of the longitudinal axes of the pin (34) and of the aperture or recess (32, 132) is permitted on movement of the control member (30) to move the operating levers (24). In one embodiment, the projection (41) is provided on the pin (34) and, in another embodiment, the projection (141) is provided on the wall of the aperture (132). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031703 A2 20000830; EP 1031703 A3 20000913; GB 9904032 D0 19990414

INPADOC legal status

2001-12-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20011020

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI