Global patent index - EP 1031710 A1

EP 1031710 A1 2000-08-30 - Exhaust assembly structure

Title (en)

Exhaust assembly structure

Title (de)

Auspuffvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Unité d'échappement

Publication

EP 1031710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102775 A

Priority

JP 4863799 A

Abstract (en)

An exhaust chamber(64) is integrally provided with a muffler (65), and when a plurality of exhaust pipes (11,12) have different lengths, the exhaust pipe (11), which is longer, is set to have a larger diameter so that the exhaust pipes (11,12)have substantially equal exhaust resistance. Exhaust pipes (11,12) can be set in a substantially linear arrangement so that exhaust resistance of the respective exhaust pipes (11,12) can be reduced. Also, as a longer exhaust pipe (11) is set to have a larger diameter, exhaust resistance for the respective exhaust pipes (11,12)can be set substantially equal. Therefore, fuel adjustment of the carburetors for fuel supply to the respective cylinders can be readily achieved, and, in combination with the substantially linear arrangement of the exhaust pipes (11,12),engine output performance can be improved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/04; F01N 1/08; F01N 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/04 (2006.01); F01N 1/08 (2006.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1855 (2013.01); F01N 1/04 (2013.01); F01N 1/089 (2013.01); F01N 13/04 (2013.01); F01N 13/08 (2013.01); F01N 13/18 (2013.01); F01N 2490/155 (2013.01); F01N 2590/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031710 A1 20000830; EP 1031710 B1 20020327; DE 60000095 D1 20020502; DE 60000095 T2 20020718; ES 2174780 T3 20021116; JP 2000248925 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60000095

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080211

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-03-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-02-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174780

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60000095

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FURUKAWA, KAZUAKI C/O K.K. HONDA GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AMINO, HIDEO, C/O K.K. HONDA GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI