Global Patent Index - EP 1031788 A2

EP 1031788 A2 2000-08-30 - Method for starting a once-through waste heat boiler and device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for starting a once-through waste heat boiler and device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Anfahren eines Zwangdurchlauf-Abhitzekessels und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour démarrer une chaudière de récupération à passage unique et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1031788 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810061 A

Priority

DE 19907451 A

Abstract (en)

The steam generator run-up method has the steam generator (1) and the associated water/steam circuit (25) filled with water up to the level of a steam/water separator (8), before initiating heating, with a blocking valve (7) infront of the steam turbine (6) closed and the blocking valve (10) in the bypass line leading to the separator opened. When the steam requirement for the steam turbine is reached. the first blocking valve is opened and the second blocking valve is closed An Independent claim for a water/steam circuit for run-up of a steam generator is also included.

Abstract (de)

Ein Separator (8) ist nach dem Überhitzerabschnitt (4) des Zwangdurchlauf-Abhitzekessels (1) angeordnet. Von einer Austrittsleitung (5), die vom Überhitzerabschnitt (4) zur Dampfturbine (6) verläuft, ist eine Abzweigleitung (9) abgezweigt, die zum Separator (8) verläuft. Vom Separator (8) verläuft eine Ausströmleitung (11) für abgeschiedenes Wasser zum Zwangdurchlauf-Abhitzekessel (1). Der im Separator (8) abgeschiedene Dampf kann durch eine Bypassleitung (13) zum Kondensator/Hotwell (14) strömen. Zum Anfahren des Zwangdurchlauf-Abhitzekessels (1) wird dieser mit Wasser gefüllt, das Wasser durch den Separator (8) und die Ausströmleitung (11) im Zwangdurchlauf-Abhitzekessel (1) bzw. Wasser-/Dampf-Kreislauf kreislaufgeführt und die Wärmezufuhr eingeleitet. Das Hauptabsperrorgan (7) vor der Dampfturbine (6) ist dabei geschlossen, das Abzweigabsperrorgan (10) in der Abzweigleitung (9) vor dem Separator (8) ist offen. Bei einsetzender Bildung von Dampf strömt dieser aus dem Separator (8) durch die Bypassleitung (13) zum Kondensator (14). Entspricht der Dampf den Anforderungen der Dampfturbine (6), werden das Hauptabsperrorgan (7) geöffnet und das Abzweigabsperrorgan (10) geschlossen, womit ein frühzeitiges Anfahren der Dampfturbine (6) sichergestellt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 35/14; F22B 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/18 (2006.01); F22B 35/00 (2006.01); F22B 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 35/14 (2013.01); F22B 1/1815 (2013.01); F22B 35/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19907451 A1 20000824; EP 1031788 A2 20000830; EP 1031788 A3 20020417; US 6250258 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI