Global Patent Index - EP 1031790 A1

EP 1031790 A1 2000-08-30 - Improvements relating to flat flame burners

Title (en)

Improvements relating to flat flame burners

Title (de)

Verbesserungen an Flachflammenbrennern

Title (fr)

Perfectionnements apportés aux brûleurs à flamme plate

Publication

EP 1031790 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400320 A

Priority

FR 9902378 A

Abstract (en)

The burner has a fuel injection tube (18,19) extending along the burner axis and an air feed (10) formed in the casing between the side openings (11). The fuel is fed from the tube via axial openings (25) in a plane adjacent to the external plane of the combustion tunnel (9) to provide a pre-dilution of the charge before burning.

Abstract (fr)

Brûleur à flamme plate destiné notamment à l'équipement des fours de réchauffage, de maintien ou de traitement thermique de produits sidérurgiques, comportant au moins une canne d'injection de carburant (18,19) disposée selon l'axe du corps du brûleur et une alimentation en air de combustion (10) distribué dans et par ledit corps par l'intermédiaire d'orifices latéraux (11), ce brûleur étant caractérisé en ce que l'introduction du carburant (21) s'effectue par l'intermédiaire de la ou des cannes d'injection (18,19), par un ou plusieurs orifices axiaux (25) situés dans un plan proche du plan externe (P) du tunnel de combustion (9), dans les produits de combustion (22) afin de réaliser une première dilution du carburant dans ces produits de combustion et en ce que le mélange (23) carburant plus produits de combustion ainsi obtenu est encore dilué dans l'air de combustion (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/56 (2006.01); F23D 14/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/22 (2013.01); F23C 2202/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031790 A1 20000830; EP 1031790 B1 20041013; AT 279688 T 20041015; CA 2299530 A1 20000825; CA 2299530 C 20080812; CN 1139743 C 20040225; CN 1265456 A 20000906; DE 1031790 T1 20010705; DE 60014727 D1 20041118; DE 60014727 T2 20051103; ES 2153802 T1 20010316; ES 2153802 T3 20050401; FR 2790309 A1 20000901; FR 2790309 B1 20010511; JP 2000249312 A 20000912; US 2002055078 A1 20020509; US 6461145 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140204

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140205

2015-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150408

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60014727

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 279688 T

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60014727

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120204

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120204

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153802 T3

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014727 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030730

2001-07-05 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES GB IT

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-03-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153802 T1

2001-03-14 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI