Global Patent Index - EP 1031793 A2

EP 1031793 A2 2000-08-30 - Cooking hob with a frame

Title (en)

Cooking hob with a frame

Title (de)

Kochmulde mit einem Muldenrahmen

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson avec cadre

Publication

EP 1031793 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101280 A

Priority

DE 19904056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19904056A1] The cooking tray (1) has a frame with at least one refined steel decorative strip (5)surrounding the sides of a plate (3). A refined steel decorative partition strip (7) separates the serving (11) and cooking (9) tray parts. The decorative partition strip is on the upper side of the plate. At least one protruding beading (13) protrudes along at least part of the length of the partition strip.

Abstract (de)

Bekannt ist eine Kochmulde mit Muldenrahmen mit zumindest einer Rahmenzierleiste, die eine Muldenplatte allseitig umzieht, und mit einer Trennzierleiste, die einen Bedienbereich der Muldenplatte von deren Kochbereich trennt. Um den Aufbau der Mulde zu vereinfachen, ist die Muldenplatte einstückig ausgebildet, wobei die Trennzierleiste auf der Oberseite der Muldenplatte angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10; H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2013.01); F24C 15/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19904056 A1 20000803; EP 1031793 A2 20000830; EP 1031793 A3 20011219; US 6276357 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI