Global Patent Index - EP 1031795 A2

EP 1031795 A2 2000-08-30 - Modular hydraulic assembly

Title (en)

Modular hydraulic assembly

Title (de)

Modulare hydraulische Anordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble modulaire hydraulique

Publication

EP 1031795 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830130 A

Priority

IT RM990128 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a modular hydraulic assembly comprising a combination of at least two modules chosen among a pump module (A), a flow switch-dearation device module (B), a three way valve module (C), and a sanitary module (D), said modules being provided with union and/or orienteering means to allow their coupling each other in function of the kind of boiler, and means for the connection with the hydraulic plants. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10; F24D 3/08; F24D 19/08; F24H 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01); F24D 3/10 (2006.01); F24D 19/08 (2006.01); F24H 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2013.01); F24D 3/105 (2013.01); F24D 19/087 (2013.01); F24H 9/14 (2013.01); F24H 9/142 (2013.01); Y02B 30/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031795 A2 20000830; EP 1031795 A3 20021120; IT 1308197 B1 20011210; IT RM990128 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI