Global Patent Index - EP 1031798 A1

EP 1031798 A1 2000-08-30 - Air conditioning unit with discharge of air on three sides

Title (en)

Air conditioning unit with discharge of air on three sides

Title (de)

Klimaanlage mit Luftaustritt durch drei Seiten

Title (fr)

Emetteur de chaud et de froid à rejet d'air par trois faces latérales

Publication

EP 1031798 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400422 A

Priority

  • EP 99400422 A
  • FR 9801536 A

Abstract (en)

The air blower has a front face heat exchanger (1) covering a centrifugal reaction fan (9) with a forward-pointing axis of rotation and air outlets round three sides. The heat exchanger feed and return pipes (4) pass through the fourth side of a cover with air outlet slits formed by louvres in its three other sides.

Abstract (fr)

Un ventilateur centrifuge à réaction (9) est installé derrière un échangeur de chaleur (1) par lequel l'air à échauffer ou refroidir un local est aspiré. L'air est évacué par trois faces latérales de l'émetteur avant de se diffuser dans l'atmosphère, et les conduits (4) d'alimentation de l'échangeur (1) s'éloignent par la quatrième face. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00; F04D 29/58; F24F 13/06; F28D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/58 (2006.01); F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F28D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/582 (2013.01); F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 1/0022 (2013.01); F28D 1/024 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774747 A1 19990813; FR 2774747 B1 20000303; EP 1031798 A1 20000830

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI