Global Patent Index - EP 1031801 A3

EP 1031801 A3 2001-12-05 - Heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1031801 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00103971 A

Priority

JP 4923399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1031801A2] The present invention provides a heat exchanger capable of improving heat exchange efficiency. The heat exchanger, in which a plurality of flat plate-shaped fins 1a are stacked at predetermined intervals, heat exchanger tubes 2 for passing refrigerant therethrough are inserted in a stacking direction, air is caused to pass through between each fin group 1, and the heat exchanger tubes 2 are disposed in a plurality of rows in an air passage direction A, is characterized in that: the heat exchanger tube 2 is partitioned into a portion for containing gas and a high proportion of gaseous phase of a gas-liquid two-layer flow of the refrigerant flowing in said tube, and a portion for containing liquid and a high proportion of liquid phase of the gas-liquid two-layer flow of the refrigerant; first heat exchanger tubes 2a and 2b of a 2-pass structure are disposed as the former portion, and a second heat exchanger tube 2c of a 1-pass structure is disposed as the latter portion; these first and second heat exchanger tubes 2a, 2b and 2c are communicated to each other through a coupling member 3; each pass of these first and second heat exchanger tubes 2a, 2b and 2c has, when the heat exchanger is operated as a condenser, an inlet in a leeward-side row and an outlet in a windward-side row; and at least part of the passes are of a counterflow type, being overlapped between a plurality of rows in the air passage direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/00; F28D 1/047; F28F 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 39/00 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/047 (2006.01); F28F 9/26 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/26 (2013.01); F25B 39/00 (2013.01); F28D 1/0477 (2013.01); F25B 9/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031801 A2 20000830; EP 1031801 A3 20011205; CN 1265463 A 20000906; JP 2000249479 A 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051005

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031209

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GR IT SE

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020117

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GR IT SE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI