Global Patent Index - EP 1031861 A3

EP 1031861 A3 2000-10-11 - Filling material for fibre optical cables

Title (en)

Filling material for fibre optical cables

Title (de)

Füllmasse für Lichtwellenleiterkabel

Title (fr)

Matière de remplissage pour câbles à fibres optiques

Publication

EP 1031861 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00105947 A

Priority

  • EP 97108917 A
  • US 65903196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811864A1] Disclosed are hydrophobic compositions useful for filling the voids within jacketed optical fiber cables. The compositions include about 85 to 95 parts by weight of mineral oil, 5 to 15 parts by weight of a (styrene) - (ethylene/propylene) diblock copolymer having a styrene: (ethylene/propylene) ratio of 37.5:62.5 to 27.5:72.5 and a specific gravity of about 0.90 to 0.95, optional antioxidant, and optional metal deactivator. The oil is selected from naphtanic mineral oils comprising 45 to 50 wt.% naphtanics and the balance paraffins and having a pour point of -45 DEG F to -25 DEG F and poly-alphaolefins and mixtures thereof having a pour point of -100 DEG F to -50 DEG F.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/44; C10M 169/02; C10M 171/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 23/00 (2006.01); C08L 57/02 (2006.01); C10M 169/00 (2006.01); C10M 169/02 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); G02B 6/44 (2006.01); H01B 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/02 (2013.01); C10M 169/00 (2013.01); C10M 169/044 (2013.01); G02B 6/4401 (2013.01); G02B 6/4494 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2205/006 (2013.01); C10M 2205/02 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0213 (2013.01); C10M 2205/022 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0225 (2013.01); C10M 2205/024 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0245 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0265 (2013.01); C10M 2205/028 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0285 (2013.01); C10M 2205/04 (2013.01); C10M 2205/046 (2013.01); C10M 2205/066 (2013.01); C10M 2205/086 (2013.01); C10M 2205/106 (2013.01); C10M 2205/126 (2013.01); C10M 2205/14 (2013.01); C10M 2205/146 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2223/02 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/049 (2013.01); C10M 2223/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 169/00 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 107/04 + C10M 107/06 + C10M 107/08 + C10M 107/10 + C10M 113/12 + C10M 119/02 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 133/44 + C10M 137/02
  2. C10M 169/02 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 107/04 + C10M 107/06 + C10M 107/08 + C10M 107/10 + C10M 113/12 + C10M 119/02
  3. C10M 169/044 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 107/04 + C10M 107/06 + C10M 107/08 + C10M 107/10 + C10M 125/26 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 133/44 + C10M 137/02 + C10M 143/10

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0811864 A1 19971210; EP 0811864 B1 20011114; AR 007388 A1 19991027; AT 208910 T 20011115; AT 334416 T 20060815; BR 9703274 A 19980929; CA 2206421 A1 19971203; CN 1181511 A 19980513; DE 69708205 D1 20011220; DE 69708205 T2 20020627; DE 69736405 D1 20060907; DE 69736405 T2 20070308; DK 0811864 T3 20020318; DK 1031861 T3 20061030; EP 1031861 A2 20000830; EP 1031861 A3 20001011; EP 1031861 B1 20060726; ES 2165542 T3 20020316; ES 2265309 T3 20070216; ID 17702 A 19980122; JP H1067913 A 19980310; MX 9704083 A 19980628; PE 77998 A1 19981205; PT 1031861 E 20061130; PT 811864 E 20020429; US 5737469 A 19980407

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070603

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070603

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070603

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061027

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070603

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-02-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070603

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-01-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032444

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SONNEBORN INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2265309

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-11-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20060403372

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2006-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-10-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-10-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69736405

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-07-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0811864

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-05-03 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: ATBECHDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSE

- Effective date: 20060313

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONNENBORN INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CROMPTON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030606

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CROMPTON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 811864

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG