Global Patent Index - EP 1031897 A2

EP 1031897 A2 2000-08-30 - Electric partnership clock system

Title (en)

Electric partnership clock system

Title (de)

Elektrische Partnerschafts-Uhrenanlage

Title (fr)

Système d' horloges électriques pour alliance

Publication

EP 1031897 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103246 A

Priority

DE 19906760 A

Abstract (en)

The system has at least two watches (1) that are actuated simultaneously at a defined time (start of the partnership) and run identically from this time onwards. Both or all watches in the partnership watch system have time displays (2) that indicate the time in days since the start of the partnership.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine elektrische Partnerschafts-Uhrenanlage bestehend aus wenigstens zwei Uhren (1), wobei gilt: die wenigstens zwei Uhren (1) sind zu einem bestimmten Zeitpunkt (Beginn der Partnerschaft) gleichzeitig betätigbar und laufen ab diesem Zeitpunkt gleich; und beide bzw. sämtliche Uhren der Partnerschafts-Uhrenanlage weisen eine Zeitanzeigeeinrichtung (2) auf, welche die seit Beginn der Partnerschaft abgelaufene Zeit nach Tagen anzeigt. Die Zeitanzeigeeinrichtung (2) der Uhr (1) weist eine analoge oder digitale 24-Stunden-Anzeige (3, 8) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04F 10/00; G04G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04F 10/00 (2006.01); G04G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 9/0082 (2013.01); G04F 10/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031897 A2 20000830; EP 1031897 A3 20021218; DE 19906760 A1 20000831; DE 19906760 C2 20001207

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021219

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI