Global Patent Index - EP 1031900 A1

EP 1031900 A1 2000-08-30 - Regulator

Title (en)

Regulator

Title (de)

Regler

Title (fr)

Régulateur

Publication

EP 1031900 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301022 A

Priority

JP 4331399 A

Abstract (en)

In a regulator for pressurized fluid, the opening and closing operations of a poppet valve 22 are stabilized by preventing a diaphragm 15 and the poppet valve 22 from being inclined so that the pressure adjusting accuracy of the regulator is increased. This is achieved by fitting the diaphragm 15 with a piston 18 and guiding the poppet valve 22 and the piston 18 with a sleeve 19 by slidably inserting the piston 18 into the sleeve 19. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 16/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01L 7/08 (2006.01); F16K 7/00 (2006.01); G05D 16/02 (2006.01); G05D 16/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05D 16/0661 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7825 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031900 A1 20000830; EP 1031900 B1 20030820; CN 1178116 C 20041201; CN 1264827 A 20000830; DE 60004583 D1 20030925; DE 60004583 T2 20040624; JP 2000242338 A 20000908; JP 3502561 B2 20040302; KR 100367416 B1 20030110; KR 20010006661 A 20010126; TW 430060 U 20010411; US 6289925 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040209

2004-09-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60004583

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000219

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI