Global Patent Index - EP 1031918 A1

EP 1031918 A1 2000-08-30 - Closing device

Title (en)

Closing device

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture

Publication

EP 1031918 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103440 A

Priority

DE 19908511 A

Abstract (en)

The door lock (2) has an electronic control device, for verifying the validity of an operating key (3), e.g. a transponder, to allow the lock to be moved between the locked and open positions. The control device has an associated deactivation device (7), for deactivating the control device when a sensor (8) detects that the lock is in the locked position, with subsequent arming of an intruder alarm circuit.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Schließvorrichtung eignet sich zum Ersatz gewöhnlicher Türschlösser und erfüllt außerdem die Funktion eines Blockschlosses bei Kombination mit einer Alarmanlage. Die Schließvorrichtung enthält eine Schließmechanik mit elektronischer Steuereinheit, beispielsweise in Form eines elektronischen Schließzylinders oder eines elektronischen Türschlosses, sowie eine Deaktivierungseinrichtung 7, die mittels eines Sensors 8 prüft, ob die Schließmechanik sperrt, dann die Steuereinheit deaktiviert, so daß die Schließmechanik nicht mehr betätigt werden kann und erst dann ein Scharfschalten der Alarmanlage 5 freigibt. Ein Scharfschalten der Alarmanlage ist daher erst möglich, wenn der gesicherte Bereich abgeschlossen ist und auch von zutrittsberechtigten Personen nicht mehr versehentlich betreten werden kann. Die Datenkommunikation zwischen der Deaktivierungseinrichtung 7 und der Steuereinheit der Schließmechanik 2 kann mit sehr geringem Aufwand installiert werden. Ein Kabelübergang von der Türzarge zur Tür 1 ist nicht notwendig. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 7/06; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 45/06 (2006.01); G08B 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/008 (2013.01); E05B 45/06 (2013.01); E05B 2045/0695 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031918 A1 20000830; EP 1031918 B1 20031112; DE 19908511 A1 20000907

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2013-11-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIMONSVOSS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIMONSVOSS TECHNOLOGIES AG, 85774 UNTERFOEHRING, DE

- Document: DE 50004387

- Effective date: 20130919

2013-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004387

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130919

2013-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004387

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20130919

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130314

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-02-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-01-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SIMONSVOSS TECHNOLOGIES AG

2004-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SIMONSVOSS TECHNOLOGIES AG

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-10-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIMONSVOSS TECHNOLOGIES AG

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004387 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI