Global Patent Index - EP 1031950 A1

EP 1031950 A1 2000-08-30 - Currency handling apparatus

Title (en)

Currency handling apparatus

Title (de)

Geldbehandlungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de manipulation d'argent

Publication

EP 1031950 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301462 A

Priority

GB 9904282 A

Abstract (en)

A method of setting float levels for subsequent use in a currency handling apparatus for dispensing currency units from a plurality of stores, the method comprising: manually adding or subtracting currency units to the or each store; and memorising the altered levels as new float levels for subsequent use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 5/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031950 A1 20000830; GB 2347256 A 20000830; GB 2347256 B 20021231; GB 9904282 D0 19990421

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150322

2013-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEI, INC.

2012-08-08 [R11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-12-12 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-02-14 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DEESFRGB

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEI, INC.

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050623

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI