Global Patent Index - EP 1031951 A1

EP 1031951 A1 2000-08-30 - Method for operating a group of at least two money-actuated game machines

Title (en)

Method for operating a group of at least two money-actuated game machines

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Gruppe aus mindestens zwei geldbetätigten Spielgeräten

Title (fr)

Procédé d'exploitation d'un groupe d'au moins deux machines de jeu déclenché par des pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 1031951 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102820 A

Priority

  • DE 19907623 A
  • DE 19925805 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using individual value coin stack tubes and a common note processing device (15) that is either integrated into one of the games devices (2-3) or spatially separate from the games devices and bi-directionally connected to computer-controlled control units (14) in the games devices. The ability to play one of the games devices is selected under button control. At the end of a game a remaining cash sum is output under computer or button control selectively in coin form at the games device and/or as notes via a notes dispenser (18) in the note processing machine.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Gruppe aus mindestens zwei geldbetätigten Spielgeräten (2, 3, 4) ist eine gemeinsame Geldschein-Verarbeitungseinrichtung (15) entweder in einem der Spielgeräte (2, 3, 4) integriert oder räumlich getrennt zu den Spielgeräten (2, 3, 4) angeordnet und steht bidirektional mit rechnergesteuerten Steuereinheiten (14) der Spielgeräte (2, 3, 4) in Verbindung. Die Bespielbarkeit eines der Spielgeräte (2, 3, 4) wird tastengesteuert ausgewählt. Um eine variable Auszahlung von Geldbeträgen in Münzen und/oder Geldscheinen zu ermöglichen, wird bei Beendigung eines Spiels ein verbleibender Geldbetrag rechner- oder tastengesteuert wahlweise in Münzgeld am jeweiligen Spielgerät (2, 3, 4) und/oder in Geldscheinen über einen Geldscheinausgeber (18) der Geldschein-Verarbeitungsein-richtung (15) ausgegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32; G07F 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3281 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031951 A1 20000830; EP 1031951 B1 20070411; AT 359573 T 20070515; DE 50014227 D1 20070524; ES 2284433 T3 20071116

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170303

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-09-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: LOEWEN ENTERTAINMENT GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 359573 T

- Effective date: 20130716

2013-04-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LOEWEN ENTERTAINMENT GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NSM-LOEWEN ENTERTAINMENT GMBH, 55411 BINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50014227

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-04-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014227

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-04-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014227

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120131

2013-03-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: LOWEN ENTERTAINMENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-03-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014227

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2013-01-30 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130123

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014227

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014227

- Representative's name: JOCHEN MUELLER, DE

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284433 T3

2007-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014227 P 20070524

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NSM-LOEWEN ENTERTAINMENT GMBH

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES GB IT NL

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI