Global patent index - EP 1031997 A1

EP 1031997 A1 2000-08-30 - Electronic system for operating under radiation, method for designing such a system and implementing the same for driving a mobile robot

Title (en)

Electronic system for operating under radiation, method for designing such a system and implementing the same for driving a mobile robot

Title (de)

Unter Strahlung arbeitendes elektronisches System, Verfahren zur Gestaltung desselben und dessen Anwendung zur Steuerung eines beweglichen Roboters

Title (fr)

Système électronique fonctionnant sous irradiation, procédé de conception d'un tel système, et application de celui-ci à la commande d'un robot mobile

Publication

EP 1031997 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400473 A

Priority

FR 9902419 A

Abstract (en)

A group of components (21) most vulnerable to radiation is selected and protected by a shield (22), while a second group (20) of components that would not benefit from the protection is left unshielded. The radiation shield comprises two half-shells enclosing the first group of components, including at least one microcontroller and an analog/digital converter, connected to an interface card by a supple printed circuit (23) which follows a chicane through the shield inlet/outlet.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un système électronique fonctionnant sous irradiation, et un procédé de conception d'un tel système, permettant de déterminer un premier groupe (21) de composants à forte intégration et grande vulnérabilité destinés à être sélectivement protégé par un blindage (22), le reste des composants (20) ne bénéficiant pas d'une telle protection. Une application du procédé est faite pour un système de commande électronique d'un robot mobile apte à fonctionner en présence de rayonnements ionisants (typiquement gammas). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 3/00 (2006.01); G21F 7/06 (2006.01); G21F 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 7/065 (2013.01); G21F 7/066 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/203 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/205 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/206 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/301 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/304 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/401 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/501 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/30 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/40 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031997 A1 20000830; EP 1031997 B1 20031105; CA 2299616 A1 20000826; DE 60006300 D1 20031211; DE 60006300 T2 20040826; ES 2209772 T3 20040701; FR 2790327 A1 20000901; FR 2790327 B1 20010413; JP 2000249788 A 20000914; US 6812476 B1 20041102

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-10-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-02-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209772

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-02-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60006300

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI