Global Patent Index - EP 1032003 A3

EP 1032003 A3 2001-05-02 - Arrangement for sealing a cylindrical oil vessel for a switch

Title (en)

Arrangement for sealing a cylindrical oil vessel for a switch

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Abdichtung eines zylindrischen Olgefässes eines Schalters

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rendre étanche d'un boîtier cylindrique d'huile d'un commutateur

Publication

EP 1032003 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00103220 A

Priority

AT 31499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1032003A2] The arrangement has an outer groove (5) in an insulating tube (1) with a semicircular cross-section, in which a clamping ring (6) of round cross-section is arranged, and at least one threaded bore (7) in a metal flange at an acute angle to the end of the insulating tube with a bolt 8 whose end acts upon he clamp ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00; H01F 29/02; H01H 33/55

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 29/02 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 33/55 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0044 (2013.01); H01F 29/025 (2013.01); H01H 33/55 (2013.01); H01H 2009/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032003 A2 20000830; EP 1032003 A3 20010502; EP 1032003 B1 20060524; AT 409563 B 20020925; AT A31499 A 20020115; DE 50012796 D1 20060629

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070217

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-02-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070218

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50012796

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE SE

2006-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STROF, THOMAS, DIPL.-ING. DR.

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK REINHAUSEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI