Global Patent Index - EP 1032006 A2

EP 1032006 A2 2000-08-30 - Control device

Title (en)

Control device

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande

Publication

EP 1032006 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00660029 A

Priority

FI 990386 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a control device (1) to be arranged to a three-position switching device including one axis wherein the switching motion is controlled from a common axis. The switching device is then controlled by turning the control shaft in the apparatus clockwise or counter-clockwise. The present invention provides a completely new solution that ensures a safe operation of the switching device and enables to carry out checking and servicing using simple means. The control device (1) of the invention comprises a housing (5) arranged at the switching device, and a control plate (7) arranged to move in the housing substantially along the surface of the apparatus receiving the switching device. Such a control plate comprises at least two crank openings (10) to be moved at the control shaft of the switching device. The use of the switching device can then be regulated by moving the crank openings or the necks (11, 12) on both sides thereof at the control shaft, thus preventing or allowing the manual controller controlling the switching device to be arranged to a tuning end (13) in the control shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/28; H01H 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/22 (2006.01); H01H 9/28 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/282 (2013.01); H01H 9/22 (2013.01); H01H 31/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032006 A2 20000830; EP 1032006 A3 20011121; EP 1032006 B1 20081015; AU 1844400 A 20000824; AU 762088 B2 20030619; BR 0000656 A 20000905; CN 1154135 C 20040616; CN 1264908 A 20000830; DE 60040502 D1 20081127; FI 106155 B 20001130; FI 990386 A0 19990223; FI 990386 A 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-09-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090716

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090126

2008-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040502 P 20081127

2008-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2008-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TECHNOLOGY AG

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020308

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI