Global Patent Index - EP 1032007 A3

EP 1032007 A3 2001-05-23 - Encoding switch with a rotatable switch member

Title (en)

Encoding switch with a rotatable switch member

Title (de)

Kodierschalter mit einem drehbaren Schaltglied

Title (fr)

Commutateur de codage avec élément de commutation rotatif

Publication

EP 1032007 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00250069 A

Priority

DE 19910149 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1032007A2] An encoding switch (1) has its points of contact (3,4,5) arranged in a circle on a flat substrate (2), and the switching member (7), mounted for rotation and interaction with the fixed contacts (3,4,5), is constantly engaged with an incoming point of contact (11) on the substrate (2). The fixed contacts (3,4,5) are uniformly distributed around a circular path concentrically positioned relative to the axis of rotation of the switching member (7), which has three sliding contacts (8) arranged with half as much spacing or pitch as the fixed contacts (3,4,5). The fixed contacts' spacing around the circular track and the width of the sliding contacts (8) is calculated so that, depending on the position of the switching member, one sliding contact or two sliding contacts engages or engage with one or with two of the fixed contacts (3,4,5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/585 (2013.01); H01H 2019/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032007 A2 20000830; EP 1032007 A3 20010523; DE 19910149 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI