Global Patent Index - EP 1032009 A2

EP 1032009 A2 2000-08-30 - Gas blast switch

Title (en)

Gas blast switch

Title (de)

Druckgasschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à gaz comprimé

Publication

EP 1032009 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122825 A

Priority

DE 19907838 A

Abstract (en)

The switch has a pair of cooperating contact pieces (2,3), each coupled to a terminal block via a main current path, with a parallel current path for each main current path containing a current reduction component, e.g. of a ferromagnetic material. The contact pieces (2,3) are coupled via a double-armed lever (6) with an insulation jet (9) associated with one lever arm, the other lever arm electrically coupled to one of the contact pieces via a rod (8) made of a ferromagnetic material, which provides a parallel current path.

Abstract (de)

Es ist ein Druckgasschalter mit folgenden Merkmalen beschrieben: der Druckgasschalter weist eine Unterbrechungsstelle auf, die Unterbrechungsstelle weist zwei Kontaktstücke (2, 3) auf, von jedem der beiden Kontaktstücke (2, 3) verläuft ein Hauptstrompfad zu einem Anschlußstück, zu einem der beiden Hauptstrompfade ist ein Parallelstrompfad vorhanden, in dem Parallelstrompfad ist ein stromminderndes Bauteil enthalten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/91

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/90 (2006.01); H01H 33/915 (2006.01); H01H 33/985 (2006.01); H01H 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/904 (2013.01); H01H 33/16 (2013.01); H01H 2033/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032009 A2 20000830; EP 1032009 A3 20010829; EP 1032009 B1 20060802; DE 19907838 A1 20000831; DE 59913734 D1 20060914

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-20 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2015-08-04 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2015-05-28 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 59913734

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150528

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060802

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060802

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-22 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-03-31 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLX

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-05 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 59913734

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-05 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 59913734

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-07-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59913734

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120524

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59913734

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120524

2012-02-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFUS

2011-12-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-06-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-06-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG ABTEILUNG: CT IP PTD

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-06-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913734

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR LI SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011027

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI