Global Patent Index - EP 1032017 A1

EP 1032017 A1 2000-08-30 - Resistive anode of a flat viewing screen

Title (en)

Resistive anode of a flat viewing screen

Title (de)

Anode mit Widerstand für einen flachen Bildschirm

Title (fr)

Anode résistive d'écran plat de visualisation

Publication

EP 1032017 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410018 A

Priority

FR 9902654 A

Abstract (en)

The luminophore material is supported on a resistive layer. The flat anode display screen comprises luminophorescent elements (4R, 4G, 4B) which are intended to be excited by electronic bombardment. These elements are arranged on at least one biasing electrode. The elements form a stack consisting of a resistive layer (8), itself deposited on a conductive layer (5B, 5R, 5G) forming a bias layer for the luminophorescent elements. The luminophore elements may either be deposited directly on top of the resistive layer (8) or they may be deposited on a conducting reflective layer which is itself deposited on the resistive layer.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une anode d'écran plat de visualisation, comportant des éléments luminophores (4R, 4G, 4B) destinés à être excités par un bombardement électronique, ces éléments étant déposés sur au moins une électrode de polarisation constituée, au moins au droit des éléments luminophores, d'un empilement comprenant une couche résistive (8), elle-même déposée sur une couche conductrice (5B, 5R, 5G) de polarisation des éléments luminophores. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/28 (2006.01); G09F 9/30 (2006.01); H01J 29/08 (2006.01); H01J 29/32 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032017 A1 20000830; EP 1032017 B1 20060426; DE 60027494 D1 20060601; DE 60027494 T2 20070419; FR 2790329 A1 20000901; FR 2790329 B1 20010518; JP 2000251755 A 20000914; US 6815885 B1 20041109

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080225

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080225

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080225

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60027494

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LE COMMISSARIAT AE L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-02 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20050502

2003-04-23 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI