Global patent index - EP 1032081 A1

EP 1032081 A1 2000-08-30 - Child proof electrical socket

Title (en)

Child proof electrical socket

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckdose mit Kindersicherung

Title (fr)

Prise électrique avec sécurité pour les enfants

Publication

EP 1032081 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102523 A

Priority

DE 19907885 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical plug socket (1) has at least one slider (5), which covers the phase connections and which is displaced for revealing the phase connections by simultaneous axial insertion of at least 2 plug pins of an electrical plug. The slider is acted on by a spring (16), for biasing it in the closed direction and has at least one axial projection fitting into a guide path.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Steckdose mit wenigstens einem zumindest die Phasenanschlüsse normalerweise verdeckenden Schieber, der wenigstens durch zwei zumindest im wesentlichen gleichzeitig axial in die Steckdose eindringende Steckerstifte eines Steckers in eine Phasenanschluß-Freigabeposition drängbar ist, welche dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß der Schieber wenigstens einen allgemein axialen Ansatz aufweist, der in eine zugeordnete Führungsbahn vorsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/453

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4534 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032081 A1 20000830; DE 19907885 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040607

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI