Global patent index - EP 1032082 A2

EP 1032082 A2 2000-08-30 - Device for cable feed-through

Title (en)

Device for cable feed-through

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Kabeldurchführung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour traversée de câble

Publication

EP 1032082 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102937 A

Priority

DE 19907636 A

Abstract (en)

The cable gland (1) has a gland element inserted in an opening in the wall of the transmission housing, fitted with an electrical insulation element (9), receiving the individual cable elements (6.1,6.2) of each electrical cable (7.1,7.2). Each of the cable elements is split into 2 sections within the insulation element, with the ends of the cable element sections joined together via crimp connections.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Kabeldurchführung zur Realisierung eines Überganges von Kabeln von einem mit Schmiermittel oder ähnlichen wenigstens teilweise befüllten oder Rückstände enthaltenden und durch ein Gehäuse wenigsten teilweise umschlossenen Raumbereich nach außerhalb des Raumbereiches mit einem, eine Durchgangsöffnung aufweisenden Übergangselement; mit einem im Übergangselement angeordneten und aus elektrisch nicht leitfähigen Material bestehenden Isolierkörper zur Durchführung einzelner Kabelelemente eines Kabels; jedes Kabelelement ist im Bereich des Isolierkörpers geteilt ausgeführt und die durch Teilung erzeugten Enden sind im Isolierkörper über eine krimpfähige Kupplung miteinander elektrisch gekoppelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52; H01R 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/186 (2013.01); H01R 13/5216 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032082 A2 20000830; EP 1032082 A3 20030514; DE 19907636 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060303

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/52 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/18 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/20 B

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI