Global Patent Index - EP 1032083 A2

EP 1032083 A2 2000-08-30 - Cable clamp for the mechanical holding and the electrical connection of a cable

Title (en)

Cable clamp for the mechanical holding and the electrical connection of a cable

Title (de)

Kabelklemme zum mechanischen Halten und elektrischen Anschliessen eines Kabels

Title (fr)

Serre-câble pour le maintien mécanique et la connexion électrique d'un câble

Publication

EP 1032083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103407 A

Priority

DE 19908455 A

Abstract (en)

The cable clamp (10) has a 2-part housing (20.50) enclosing a clamping device (16) cooperating with the inserted electrical cable (12), which is engaged by at least 2 pairs of opposing deformation elements (22,52; 24,54) with different clamping directions, positioned one after the other along the cable longitudinal axis.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kabelklemme (10) zum mechanischen Halten und elektrischen Anschließen eines Kabels (12), mit einem zweiteiligen Gehäuse (20, 50) und einer Klemmvorrichtung (16) für ein in das Gehäuse (20, 50) einzulegendes Kabel (12) ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß mindestens zwei Paare von einander gegenüberliegenden Verformungselementen (22, 52; 24, 54) vorgesehen sind, die bei geschlossenem Gehäuse (20, 50) und eingelegtem Kabel (12) an diesem angreifen und es verformen, wobei die Verformungselemente (22, 52) des ersten Paares einander in einer Klemmrichtung gegenüberliegen, die von der Klemmrichtung abweicht, in der sich die Verformungselemente (24, 54) des zweiten Paares gegenüberliegen, und wobei die beiden Paare, entlang der Längsachse (M) des in die Kabelklemme einzulegenden Kabels betrachtet, hintereinander angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/582 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032083 A2 20000830; EP 1032083 A3 20030409; EP 1032083 B1 20041124; DE 19908455 A1 20000914; DE 19908455 C2 20011213; US 6261121 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050115

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008714

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI