Global patent index - EP 1032086 A1

EP 1032086 A1 2000-08-30 - Plug connector

Title (en)

Plug connector

Title (de)

Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur à fiche

Publication

EP 1032086 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100842 A

Priority

DE 19908185 A

Abstract (en)

The connector (10) has 2 cooperating connector halves (12,14) one of which is provided with a spring arm (16) extending in the connector assembly direction, for engaging a retaining element (18) provided by the other connector half. A slider (22) attached to one of the connector halves is displaced in the connector assembly direction for blocking the release of the spring arm from the retaining element by preventing its deflection.

Abstract (de)

Ein Steckverbinder 10 umfaßt zwei zusammensteckbare Verbinderteile 12, 14, von denen eines 12 mit einem federnden Rastarm 16 versehen ist, der sich allgemein in Steckrichtung S erstreckt und mit einem am anderen Verbinderteil 14 vorgesehenen Gegenrastmittel 18 zusammenwirkt. An einem 12 der beiden Verbinderteile 12, 14 ist ein Schieber 22 allgemein in Steckrichtung S verschiebbar geführt. Der Schieber 22 ist in eine Endstellung bewegbar, in der er bei zusammengesteckten Verbinderteilen 12, 14 ein die betreffende Rastverbindung lösendes Auslenken des federnden Rastarmes 22 verhindert. Der federnde Rastarm 16 wird beim Zusammenstecken der beiden Verbinderteile 12, 14 entgegen der Federkraft nach innen ausgelenkt, wobei er anschließend zur Herstellung der Rastverbindung nach außen zurückschnappt. Der federnde Rastarm 16 ist bei zusammengesteckten und miteinander verrasteten Verbinderteilen 12, 14 durch den seine Endstellung einnehmenden Schieber 22 daran gehindert, nach innen ausgelenkt zu werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/639; H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/50 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/501 (2013.01); H01R 13/627 (2013.01); H01R 13/639 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032086 A1 20000830; EP 1032086 B1 20070509; DE 19908185 A1 20000831; DE 50014310 D1 20070621

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110117

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50014310

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100208

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070509

2008-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080212

2007-12-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014310

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-06-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-05-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI