Global Patent Index - EP 1032147 A2

EP 1032147 A2 2000-08-30 - Broadcast system and terminal for receiving and reproducing broadcast signals

Title (en)

Broadcast system and terminal for receiving and reproducing broadcast signals

Title (de)

Rundfunksystem und Endgerät für den Empfang bzw. für die Wiedergabe von Rundfunksignalen

Title (fr)

Système pour la diffusion de signaux audiovisuels ainsi que terminal pour la réception et la reproduction de ces signaux

Publication

EP 1032147 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301402 A

Priority

JP 4700699 A

Abstract (en)

A broadcast system for allowing a receiving/reproducing terminal to cyclically reproduce high data-rate data even when using a communication infrastructure having a low transmission data rate is described. Program data to be reproduced in real time and content data are transmitted from a transmitting apparatus. The total data rate is divided into a first period and a second period. During the first period, the receiving/reproducing terminal reproduces the program data, such as character-based data, in real time, and also stores the content data in a memory. In the second period, the receiving/reproducing terminal reads the data stored in the memory, and based on this data and certain second period content data, the high data-rate data is reproduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04H 20/28 (2008.01); H04J 3/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/18 (2006.01); H04M 11/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/173 (2006.01); H04Q 7/06 (2006.01); H04Q 7/08 (2006.01); H04Q 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032147 A2 20000830; EP 1032147 A3 20041222; JP 2000244425 A 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080517

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071106

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050620

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI