Global Patent Index - EP 1032207 A1

EP 1032207 A1 2000-08-30 - Device for monitoring or managing a television receiver

Title (en)

Device for monitoring or managing a television receiver

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Beobachtung und Verwaltung eines Fernsehempfängers

Title (fr)

Appareil de surveillance et d'administration d'un récepteur de télévision

Publication

EP 1032207 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00400456 A

Priority

FR 9902453 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a device for monitoring or managing a television receiver. This device receive television transmissions comprising an information item relating to the transmission screened on the receiver (12). The device comprise a memory (20) for storing this information item. This device is characterized in that it comprises it comprises a detector for extracting the said information item from the television signals transmitted and a change of transmissions detector which detects a change in value of the said information item on the said channel and actuates the writing to memory of at least the said information item. The device comprises, preferably, means for recording an information item representing the duration of screening of each transmission, for example the start time and the end time of the screening of a transmission. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/40 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01); H04N 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/4667 (2013.01); H04N 7/163 (2013.01); H04N 21/44222 (2013.01); H04N 21/4532 (2013.01); H04N 21/454 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032207 A1 20000830; CN 1264985 A 20000830; FR 2790352 A1 20000901; FR 2790352 B1 20010427; JP 2000253424 A 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI