Global Patent Index - EP 1032243 A2

EP 1032243 A2 2000-08-30 - A stereophonic earphone apparatus

Title (en)

A stereophonic earphone apparatus

Title (de)

Stereophonische Hörereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'écouteur stéréophonique

Publication

EP 1032243 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101714 A

Priority

US 25766499 A

Abstract (en)

A stereophonic earphone apparatus is disclosed for incanal of a user thereof. The apparatus includes a housing which has a first and a second end and which defines an enclosure. An electroacoustic transducer is disposed within the enclosure and a diaphragm is disposed within the enclosure adjacent to the transducer. A resilient anchor having a first and a second extremity is arranged such that the first extremity is removably secured to and extends from a cover of the housing. The anchor is fabricated from a hydrophilic urethane foam having a skinned over outer surface such that when the anchor is compressed, insertion of the anchor within the ear canal is permitted. The foam has a shape restoration memory such that after insertion of the anchor within the ear canal, the foam gradually expands so that the skinned over surface thereof comes into intimate contact with the ear canal so that the apparatus is secured within the ear canal. A tube extends from the cover and is disposed within a passageway defined by the anchor. The tube has an inner and an outer face such that the outer face of the tube extends contiguously along the passageway so that the tube prevents obturation of the passageway while permitting a transmission of sound waves from the diaphragm into the ear canal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/1058 (2013.01); H04R 1/1016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1032243 A2 20000830; EP 1032243 A3 20070314; AU 1637000 A 20000831; BR 0000773 A 20001024; CA 2297423 A1 20000825; JP 2000253478 A 20000914; KR 20000058143 A 20000925; TW 478286 B 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080219

2007-11-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071008

2007-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070814

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI