Global Patent Index - EP 1032248 A2

EP 1032248 A2 2000-08-30 - Light simulating device

Title (en)

Light simulating device

Title (de)

Lichtsimulationsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de simulation de lumière

Publication

EP 1032248 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103565 A

Priority

DE 19907595 A

Abstract (en)

The light simulation device has a number of light sources (3,4), e.g. with different light colorations, coupled to a central control unit (2) with a memory (5) holding a number of different light profiles, selected via an operating device (1) and used for control of the light sources individually or in common, for providing the required natural or artificial light profile.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Lichtsimulationsvorrichtung beschrieben. Die Vorrichtung besitzt eine Vielzahl von Lichtquellen (3,4), eine zentrale Steuereinheit (2) zum Ansteuern der Lichtquellen, einen der zentralen Steuereinheit zugeordneten Speicher (5) zum Speichern einer Vielzahl von Lichtprofilen und eine Bedienungseinheit (1) zur Eingabe eines gewünschten Lichtprofiles. Die Steuereinheit ruft das gewünschte Lichtprofil aus dem Speicher ab und steuert die Lichtquellen derart an, daß diese einzeln oder gemeinsam das gewünschte Lichtprofil erzeugen. Auf diese Weise läßt sich eine Vielzahl von natürlichen oder künstlichen Lichtprofilen nachbilden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05D 25/02 (2006.01); H05B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19907595 A1 20000824; EP 1032248 A2 20000830; EP 1032248 A3 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020829

2003-02-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI