Global patent index - EP 1032292 A1

EP 1032292 A1 2000-09-06 - BENCH WITH MODULAR STRUCTURE

Title (en)

BENCH WITH MODULAR STRUCTURE

Title (de)

MODULAR AUFBAUBARE SITZBANK

Title (fr)

BANC A STRUCTURE MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 1032292 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941661 A

Priority

IB 9801487 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0016661A1] The invention relates to a bench having a modular structure and comprising several seats, which rests on a longitudinal beam (1) supported on feet (2). An individual seat is formed by a seat panel (4) which can be complemented by a backrest (6) and lateral armrests (7), as well as table tops (5). Benches of this kind can be used, for example, in airports and ferry terminals as well as long-distance train stations. The seat panels (4), backrests (6) and table tops (5) are removably fixed to the longitudinal beam (1) by means of holding plates (3, 3'). The feet (2) and armrests (7) are removably fixed directly to the longitudinal beam (1). The longitudinal beam (1) extends along the full length of the bench, consists preferably of a double-walled aluminium hollow profile and has a regular, triangular cross-section with three longitudinal side faces (10, 11, 12) as well as lateral grooves (13, 14, 15) situated in the area of the edges. The holding plates (3, 3') are pieces of a U-shaped sections cut to the required length. A holding plate (3) connected to a seat panel (4) or a table top (5) rests on the upper, first side face (10) of the longitudinal beam (1), while a holding plate (3') connected to a backrest (6) contacts the rear, i.e. third, side face (10) of the longitudinal beam (1). The principal advantages of the bench provided for in the invention are its variable configuration, the fact that it can be assembled at the place of use and that functional units can be easily replaced. Considerably less transport space is required for the delivery of unassembled functional units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 13/00; A47C 4/02; A47C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/02 (2006.01); A47C 11/00 (2006.01); A47C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 11/005 (2013.01); A47C 4/02 (2013.01); A47C 4/03 (2013.01); A47C 13/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0016661A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0016661 A1 20000330; AT 231694 T 20030215; DE 59807093 D1 20030306; DK 1032292 T3 20030526; EP 1032292 A1 20000906; EP 1032292 B1 20030129; ES 2191326 T3 20030901; US 6746086 B1 20040608

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-08-29 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: AUSTRASSE 24, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2014-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LATSCHA SCHOELLHORN PARTNER AG, CH

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VITRA PATENTE A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050924

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VITRA PATENTE A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191326

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. GERHARD ULLRICH C/O AXON PATENT GMBH

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807093

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL