Global Patent Index - EP 1032297 A2

EP 1032297 A2 2000-09-06 - KITCHEN APPLIANCE FOR HEATING FOOD LOCALLY

Title (en)

KITCHEN APPLIANCE FOR HEATING FOOD LOCALLY

Title (de)

KÜCHENGERÄT ZUM LOKALEN ERHITZEN VON SPEISEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE CUISINE POUR CHAUFFER LOCALEMENT DES ALIMENTS

Publication

EP 1032297 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98947326 A

Priority

  • DE 9802084 W
  • DE 19732591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732591C1] The invention relates to a kitchen appliance for locally heating the surface of food in a saucepan or serving dish. To this end, the kitchen appliance has a handle part (3) with a plate-like element (5) at one end. A heating spiral or plate (9) inside the plate-like element (5) heats up when traversed by a current. This plate-like element (5) is preferably round, so that it can be introduced into a saucepan from above. The inventive kitchen appliance is preferably used in the caramelization of food.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47J 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47J 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47J 37/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905944A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732591 C1 19990218; AU 9430698 A 19990222; DE 19881046 D2 20000810; EP 1032297 A2 20000906; WO 9905944 A2 19990211; WO 9905944 A3 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-02-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021129

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB LI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB LI