Global Patent Index - EP 1032298 A1

EP 1032298 A1 2000-09-06 - CONTAINER WITH FUNCTION-SPECIFIC INNER SPACE CONFIGURATION

Title (en)

CONTAINER WITH FUNCTION-SPECIFIC INNER SPACE CONFIGURATION

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER MIT FUNKTIONSSPEZIFISCHER GESTALTUNG SEINES INNENRAUMS

Title (fr)

CONTENANT AVEC COMPARTIMENT INTERIEUR CON U DE MANIERE FONCTIONNELLE

Publication

EP 1032298 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936265 A

Priority

  • DE 9901484 W
  • DE 29816801 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0016677A1] A container (Z) serving particularly for transporting and storing food and drinks, comprising fixing means or securing means for retaining a function-specific insert (E) in the inner space of said container. Said insert (E) is used to accommodate one or several objects and/or heating or cooling the inner space of said container. By selecting and mounting one or more such inserts (E), the container can be easily adapted to, equipped and re-equipped for individual applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47J 39/00; A21B 3/00; F25D 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/43 (2017.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29816801 U1 19981126; AT 258407 T 20040215; AU 5147999 A 20000410; EP 1032298 A1 20000906; EP 1032298 B1 20040128; WO 0016677 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130512

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130512

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908417

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130512

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-24 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-07-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908417 P 20040304

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL