Global patent index - EP 1032375 A1

EP 1032375 A1 2000-09-06 - HYDRAULIC DIRECTIONAL VALVE

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC DIRECTIONAL VALVE

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHES WEGEVENTIL

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1032375 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99969674 A

Priority

  • DE 19844184 A
  • EP 9906807 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0018382A2] Hydraulic directional valve including a control piston (main piston, 3) which can be moved against the force of a spring (main spring, 18) by the tappet of a magnet (12) from its first position (closing position) to its second position (open position). In the closed position, the pressure chamber (7) with the pump connection (P) is closed in relation to the consumer chamber (8) and the consumer chamber with the consumer (A) is open in relation to the return chamber (20). To this end, the consumer chamber (8) and the return chamber (2) are disposed on the opposite ends of the main piston (3), i.e. the consumer chamber (8) is disposed on the side facing the magnet and the return chamber (2) is mounted on the side opposite thereto. The main piston is penetrated by a central duct (21) connecting the consumer chamber (8) and the return chamber (2). The tappet of the magnet acts upon a plunger piston that can be displaced coaxially in relation to the main piston in the valve housing and that has a seat end facing the main piston (3) that closes the central duct when it contacts the main piston.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01); F15B 19/00 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0405 (2013.01); F15B 13/044 (2013.01); F15B 19/005 (2013.01); F15B 20/008 (2013.01); Y10T 137/8158 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86919 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87217 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0018382A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0018382 A2 20000406; WO 0018382 A3 20000810; DE 19943828 A1 20000413; EP 1032375 A1 20000906; EP 1032375 B1 20050713; US 6263913 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59912263

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110531

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080914

2009-06-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912263

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030417

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE