Global Patent Index - EP 1032457 A1

EP 1032457 A1 2000-09-06 - PERINEOMETER FOR DOMESTIC USE IN PREVENTION OF URINARY INCONTINENCE

Title (en)

PERINEOMETER FOR DOMESTIC USE IN PREVENTION OF URINARY INCONTINENCE

Title (de)

GERÄT ZUR ÜBUNG DER BECKENMUSKULATUR ZUR VORBEUGUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ FÜR DEN HAUSGEBRAUCH

Title (fr)

PERINEOMETRE A USAGE DOMESTIQUE POUR LA PREVENTION DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE

Publication

EP 1032457 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97913045 A

Priority

CA 9700872 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926699A1] A perineometer for enabling a user to conduct pelvic muscle exercises under domestic conditions comprising: (a) means for manually generating pneumatic pressure in the perineometer; (b) flexible pneumatically inflatable hollow vaginal bulb means connected pneumatically to the manual penumatic pressure means (a); and (c) instrument support means connected to the pneumatic pressure means (a) or vaginal bulb means (b), said support means supporting a microprocessing means, a source of direct electrical current, and electronic pneumatic pressure sensing means, a manually manipulatable memory switch electronically connected to the microprocessing means, an on-off switching means controlling the transmission of electrical current from the electricity storage means and the microprocessing means, and an electronic digital readout display enabling a domestic user of the perineometer to monitor the performance of the perineometer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 23/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/20 (2006.01); A63B 21/008 (2006.01); A63B 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 24/0006 (2013.01); A63B 23/20 (2013.01); A63B 21/008 (2013.01); A63B 2024/0009 (2013.01); A63B 2220/17 (2013.01); A63B 2220/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926699A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926699 A1 19990603; AT 222512 T 20020915; AU 5044498 A 19990615; AU 739990 B2 20011025; CA 2311246 A1 19990603; CA 2311246 C 20090324; DE 69714869 D1 20020926; DE 69714869 T2 20030515; DK 1032457 T3 20021223; EP 1032457 A1 20000906; EP 1032457 B1 20020821; ES 2182049 T3 20030301

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151119

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151119

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69714869

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071120

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071119

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAWCHUCK DIANE J.

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PINDER KENNETH L.

- Effective date: 20041130

2006-12-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041120

2005-11-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051119

2005-08-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAWCHUCK DIANE J.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PINDER KENNETH L.

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041120

2004-11-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-01-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20031128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-19 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-10 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182049 T3

2002-12-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: M. ZARDI & CO. SA

2002-12-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69714869 20020926

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222512 T 20020915

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE