Global Patent Index - EP 1032481 A1

EP 1032481 A1 2000-09-06 - POURING DEVICE FOR METALLURGIC VESSELS AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE QUANTITY OF DISCHARGE

Title (en)

POURING DEVICE FOR METALLURGIC VESSELS AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE QUANTITY OF DISCHARGE

Title (de)

AUSGIESSEINRICHTUNG FÜR METALLURGISCHE GEFÄSSE UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR ABFLUSSMENGENSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF VERSEUR POUR CUVES METALLURGIQUES ET PROCEDE POUR REGULER LA QUANTITE D'ECOULEMENT

Publication

EP 1032481 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958803 A

Priority

  • DE 9802931 W
  • DE 19753026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753026C1] The invention relates to a pouring device for metallurgic vessels, especially for molten steel, having sliding plates arranged one behind the other which can be adjusted under a vessel opening and can be slid out again. Filters can be placed inside of said sliding plates. The pouring device also has an immersion tube which protrudes into a casting die. The sliding plates (23) have a filter part (25) provided with openings (27) which are arranged in the pouring direction and have at least one solid web plate part (24). In addition, actuators (31, 32) are provided with which the sliding plates (23) can be displaced in a conveying direction (x-direction) as well as in the same plane, however, vertical to the conveying direction (i.e. in y-direction). The invention also relates to a method for controlling the quantity of discharge of a molten mass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/24; B22D 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/18 (2006.01); B22D 41/24 (2006.01); B22D 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 43/004 (2013.01); B22D 41/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925513A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753026 C1 19981210; AT 208240 T 20011115; AU 1481799 A 19990607; EP 1032481 A1 20000906; EP 1032481 B1 20011107; ES 2163302 T3 20020116; JP 2001523578 A 20011127; US 6485673 B1 20021126; WO 9925513 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050925

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030926

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030925

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-09-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030925

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020913

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020909

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020907

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2163302

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802098

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 208240

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL