Global patent index - EP 1032537 A1

EP 1032537 A1 2000-09-06 - DEVICE FOR METERING A PASTY PRODUCT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR METERING A PASTY PRODUCT

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIEREN EINES PASTENFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE D'UN PRODUIT PATEUX

Publication

EP 1032537 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963433 A

Priority

  • DE 19751154 A
  • EP 9807163 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19751154A1] The paste is stored in a flexible container (4) with a central spout (6) seated in a rigid outer casing (2). As this casing is inserted into the mixer (1) a hollow needle (11) pierces the spout so that the contents are released. Water, from inlet (8), then draws in the paste, presumably by venturi action, to produce the required mixture that is drawn off at (9). As the container is withdrawn, even when the contents have only been partially used, a piston (not shown) closes the cut in the spout so that there is no material which can be touched freely.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/02 (2006.01); B67B 7/48 (2006.01); B67B 7/86 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/022 (2013.01); B67B 7/26 (2013.01); B67B 7/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925639A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751154 A1 19990527; DE 19751154 C2 20010405; CA 2310739 A1 19990527; EP 1032537 A1 20000906; EP 1032537 B1 20020828; HU 0100010 A2 20010528; HU 0100010 A3 20010730; NO 20002552 A 20000518; NO 20002552 D0 20000518; PL 340466 A1 20010212; SK 7302000 A3 20001009; US 6253808 B1 20010703; WO 9925639 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061110

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061110

2005-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1032537E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805348

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000510

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000510