Global Patent Index - EP 1032601 A1

EP 1032601 A1 2000-09-06 - DISPERSANTS AND DISPERSANT VISCOSITY INDEX IMPROVERS FROM SELECTIVELY HYDROGENATED POLYMERS

Title (en)

DISPERSANTS AND DISPERSANT VISCOSITY INDEX IMPROVERS FROM SELECTIVELY HYDROGENATED POLYMERS

Title (de)

DISPERGIERMITTEL UND DISPERGIERMITTEL-VISKOSITÄT-INDEXVERBESSERER AUS SELEKTIV HYDRIERTEN POLYMEREN

Title (fr)

DISPERSANTS ET ADDITIFS D'INDICE DE VISCOSITE POUR DISPERSANTS A BASE DE POLYMERES HYDROGENES SELECTIVEMENT

Publication

EP 1032601 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97948417 A

Priority

US 9721224 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925744A1] The invention provides dispersants and dispersant viscosity index improvers which include polymers of conjugated dienes which have been hydrogenated and functionalized. The dispersant substances include compositions including a copolymer of two different conjugated dienes, a copolymer of a p-alkylstyrene and a conjugated diene, or a homopolymer of a conjugated diene. The polymers are selectively hydrogenated to produce polymers which have highly controlled amounts of unsaturation, permitting highly selective functionalization. Also provided are lubricant fluids, such as mineral and synthetic oils, which have been modified in their dispersancy and/or viscometric properties by means of the dispersant substances of the invention. Also provided are methods of modifying the dispersancy and/or viscometric properties of lubricating fluids such as mineral and synthetic lubricating oils. The dispersant substances may also include a carrier fluid to provide dispersant concentrates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 8/00; C08F 8/14; C08F 8/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08C 19/00 (2006.01); C08C 19/02 (2006.01); C08F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08C 19/02 (2013.01); C08C 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925744 A1 19990527; AU 5449298 A 19990607; EP 1032601 A1 20000906; EP 1032601 A4 20010905

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

2001-09-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 08C 19/00 A, 7C 08C 19/02 B, 7C 08C 19/28 B

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRANDES, ELLEN, BERNICE

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIU, WAN-LI

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOVELESS, FREDERICK, CHARLES

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE