Global Patent Index - EP 1032603 A1

EP 1032603 A1 2000-09-06 - CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF DIENES, CATALYST OBTAINED THEREFROM, AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYDIENES USING THE SAME

Title (en)

CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF DIENES, CATALYST OBTAINED THEREFROM, AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYDIENES USING THE SAME

Title (de)

KATALYSATORKOMPONENTE ZUR POLYMERISATION VON DIENEN, DARAUS HERGESTELLTER KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIENPOLYMEREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSANTS DE CATALYSEUR DESTINES A LA POLYMERISATION DE DIENES, CATALYSEUR AINSI OBTENU, ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYDIENES A L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 1032603 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99948809 A

Priority

  • EP 99948809 A
  • EP 9906979 W
  • EP 98203313 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0018812A1] The present invention relates to a catalyst component comprising a compound of a metal selected from the group consisting of Co, Ni and rare earth elements supported on a polymer having a porosity (mercury) higher than 0.02 cm<3>/g. The use of the above catalyst component makes it possible to prepare dienic polymers, in gas-phase with high yields.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 36/04; C08F 4/02; C08F 4/54; C08F 4/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 4/02 (2006.01); C08F 4/54 (2006.01); C08F 4/602 (2006.01); C08F 4/70 (2006.01); C08F 36/02 (2006.01); C08F 36/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 36/04 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 36/04 + C08F 2/34
  2. C08F 36/04 + C08F 4/545
  3. C08F 36/04 + C08F 4/027
  4. C08F 36/04 + C08F 4/7095

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0018812A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0018812 A1 20000406; AR 021825 A1 20020807; AU 6193799 A 20000417; BR 9913013 A 20010502; CA 2310647 A1 20000406; CN 1286703 A 20010307; EP 1032603 A1 20000906; HU 0004951 A2 20010528; HU 0004951 A3 20020228; IL 135868 D0 20010520; JP 2002525402 A 20020813; ZA 200002583 B 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE