Global patent index - EP 1032641 A2

EP 1032641 A2 2000-09-06 - IMPROVED METHOD FOR PRODUCING TENSIDE GRANULATES WITH A HIGHER BULK DENSITY

Title (en)

IMPROVED METHOD FOR PRODUCING TENSIDE GRANULATES WITH A HIGHER BULK DENSITY

Title (de)

VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON TENSIDGRANULATEN MIT EINEM HOHEN SCHÜTTGEWICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE AMELIORE DESTINE A LA PRODUCTION DE GRANULES TENSIOACTIFS AVEC UNE DENSITE EN VRAC ELEVEE

Publication

EP 1032641 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98961137 A

Priority

  • DE 19750424 A
  • EP 9807060 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19750424A1] Process for producing detergent granules with a bulk density above 500 g/l from a surfactant composition which contains a non-surfactant liquid component, especially water, and is in the form of a liquid or paste at 20-80 deg C and normal pressure comprises simultaneously granulating and drying the composition in a fluidised bed. Three embodiments are claimed: (1) the fluidised bed is situated above a perforated plate through which the fluidising gas, especially air, is supplied, and the perforations are covered with a grating having a mesh size below 600 mu m; (2) the granules are classified according to the desired size range by sieving, undersize particles are recycled to the fluidised bed, oversize particles below a predetermined size are ground and recycled to the fluidised bed, and oversize particles above the predetermined size are cooled, ground and recycled to the fluidised bed; (3) the fluidised bed is situated above a perforated plate through which the fluidising gas, especially air, is supplied, and the surfactant composition is sprayed into the fluidised bed through at least one nozzle that has an additional channel for compressed air to produce a fine mist of the composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/02; C11D 11/00; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925805A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19750424 A1 19990520; DE 59813704 D1 20061012; EP 1032641 A2 20000906; EP 1032641 B1 20060830; ES 2272014 T3 20070416; US 6362157 B1 20020326; WO 9925805 A2 19990527; WO 9925805 A3 19990722

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2272014

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813704

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040915

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE