Global Patent Index - EP 1032652 A1

EP 1032652 A1 2000-09-06 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND FÜR DIESE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT CES PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1032652 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98960328 A

Priority

  • US 9824808 W
  • US 97593697 A
  • US 17903498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927079A1] Novel polynucleotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/10; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/435; C07K 14/47; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 14/475 (2013.01); C07K 14/52 (2013.01); C07K 14/575 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927079 A1 19990603; AU 1594999 A 19990615; CA 2309624 A1 19990603; EP 1032652 A1 20000906; EP 1032652 A4 20021204; JP 2002505074 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030714

2002-12-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE