Global patent index - EP 1032673 A1

EP 1032673 A1 2000-09-06 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PROTEIN ACCUMULATION

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PROTEIN ACCUMULATION

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN HINSICHTLICH DER PROTEINAKKUMULATION

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT L'ACCUMULATION DE PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1032673 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98952875 A

Priority

  • GB 9803338 W
  • GB 9724307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925835A1] The expression of proteins is improved by post-translational transport to a cellular membrane, especially transport to the extracellular space, by the use of membrane-targeting sequences. One specific use of this method is in the expression of the DNA coding sequence for the sweet-protein brazzein: transport to the extracellular space greatly increases the expression levels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/29; A01H 5/00; A01H 5/10; C12N 1/19; C12N 15/62; C12N 15/81; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/195 (2006.01); C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C07K 14/43 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/43 (2013.01); C12N 15/8242 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925835A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925835 A1 19990527; AU 1042399 A 19990607; AU 751370 B2 20020815; CA 2307539 A1 19990527; EP 1032673 A1 20000906; GB 9724307 D0 19980114; JP 2001523689 A 20011127

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031007

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE