Global patent index - EP 1032676 A2

EP 1032676 A2 2000-09-06 - CHLAMYDIA TRACHOMATIS GENOMIC SEQUENCE AND POLYPEPTIDES, FRAGMENTS THEREOF AND USES THEREOF, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF INFECTION

Title (en)

CHLAMYDIA TRACHOMATIS GENOMIC SEQUENCE AND POLYPEPTIDES, FRAGMENTS THEREOF AND USES THEREOF, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF INFECTION

Title (de)

CHLAMYDIA TRACHOMATIS GENOMISCHE SEQUENZEN UND POLYPEPTIDEN, FRAGMENTEN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON FÜR NACHWEIS, PREVENTION UND HEILUNG

Title (fr)

SEQUENCE GENOMIQUE ET POLYPEPTIDES DE CHLAMYDIA TRACHOMATIS, LEURS FRAGMENTS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS, EN PARTICULIER, POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC, LA PREVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFECTION

Publication

EP 1032676 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98955832 A

Priority

  • FR 9715041 A
  • FR 9716034 A
  • IB 9801939 W
  • US 10707798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928475A2] The subject of the invention is the genomic sequence and the nucleotide sequences encoding polypeptides of Chlamydia trachomatis, such as cellular envelope polypeptides, which are secreted or specific, or which are involved in metabolism, in the replication process or in virulence, polypeptides encoded by such sequences, as well as vectors including the said sequences and cells or animals transformed with these vectors. The invention also relates to transcriptional gene products of the Chlamydia trachomatis genome, such as, for example, antisense and ribozyme molecules, which can be used to control growth of the microorganism. The invention also relates to methods of detecting these nucleic acids or polypeptides and kits for diagnosing Chlamydia trachomatis infection. The invention also relates to a method of selecting compounds capable of modulating bacterial infection and a method for the biosynthesis or biodegradation of molecules of interest using the said nucleotide sequences or the said polypeptides. The invention finally comprises, pharmaceutical, in particular vaccine, compositions for the prevention and/or treatment of bacterial, in particular Chlamydia trachomatis, infections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/31; A01K 67/027; A61K 39/118; C07K 14/295; C07K 16/12; C07K 19/00; C12N 15/62; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/118 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/295 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C07K 17/00 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/31 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/295 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928475A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928475 A2 19990610; WO 9928475 A3 19991118; WO 9928475 A9 19990826; AU 1254599 A 19990616; AU 754264 B2 20021107; BR 9814912 A 20001003; CA 2309228 A1 19990610; CN 1280619 A 20010117; EP 1032676 A2 20000906; EP 2218730 A1 20100818; EP 2218731 A1 20100818; EP 2218732 A1 20100818; EP 2228384 A1 20100915; EP 2228385 A1 20100915; JP 2002517179 A 20020618; JP 2009219494 A 20091001; KR 100735651 B1 20070706; KR 100735652 B1 20070706; KR 100735653 B1 20070706; KR 100769103 B1 20071023; KR 100769104 B1 20071023; KR 20060109358 A 20061019; KR 20060109359 A 20061019; KR 20060109516 A 20061020; KR 20060112695 A 20061101; KR 20060112696 A 20061101

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100601

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070221

2005-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SERONO GENETICS INSTITUTE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENSET

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE