Global Patent Index - EP 1032690 A1

EP 1032690 A1 2000-09-06 - STRESS RESISTANCE GENE

Title (en)

STRESS RESISTANCE GENE

Title (de)

STRESSRESISTENZGEN

Title (fr)

GENE DE RESISTANCE AU STRESS

Publication

EP 1032690 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954624 A

Priority

  • GB 9803464 W
  • HU 9702118 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925852A1] The invention relates to - advantageously transgenic - plant cells, breeding materials, plant parts and plants in which the expression level of the aldose reductase-homologous protein is increased and which show higher resistance against stress conditions of different origin. The invention further relates to DNA molecules and vectors suitable for the expression of aldose reductase-homologous protein and processes for the preparation of plant cells overproducing aldose reductase-homologous protein. The invention is suitable for reducing damage in crops caused by harmful biotic and abiotic stress conditions and for improving harvest prospects thereby.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C07K 16/16; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/02; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/16 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0004 (2013.01); C12N 15/8271 (2013.01); C12N 15/8273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925852A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925852 A1 19990527; AR 017638 A1 20010912; AU 1167599 A 19990607; AU 752803 B2 20021003; BR 9814644 A 20001003; CA 2309757 A1 19990527; CN 1292823 A 20010425; EP 1032690 A1 20000906; HU 0101283 A2 20010828; HU 0101283 A3 20021228; HU 226743 B1 20090828; HU 9702118 A2 19990728; HU 9702118 A3 20000828; HU 9702118 D0 19980128; JP 2001523466 A 20011127; NZ 503443 A 20020301; ZA 9810540 B 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1031127

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031119

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OBERSCHALL, ATILLA

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HORVATH, GABOR

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEAK, MARIA M

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOEROK, KAROLYNE

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DUDITS, DENES

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FEHER, ATILLA

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SASS, LASZLO

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HIDEG, EVA

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OBERSCHALL, ATILLA

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HORVATH, GABOR

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEAK, MARIA

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOEROK, KAROLYNE

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DUDITS, DENES

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FEHER, ATILLA

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SASS, LASZLO

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HIDEG, EVA

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE