Global Patent Index - EP 1032712 A1

EP 1032712 A1 2000-09-06 - PROCESS AND MEANS FOR IMPROVING BEVERAGES IN GENERAL BY ADDING SWEETENING AT THE MOMENT OF CONSUMPTION

Title (en)

PROCESS AND MEANS FOR IMPROVING BEVERAGES IN GENERAL BY ADDING SWEETENING AT THE MOMENT OF CONSUMPTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER GETRÄNKE DURCH ZUSATZ VON SÜSSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN BEIM VERZEHR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'AMELIORATION DE BOISSONS EN GENERAL PAR ADJONCTION D'EDULCORANT AU MOMENT DE LA CONSOMMATION

Publication

EP 1032712 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97946055 A

Priority

  • IT 9700295 W
  • IT MI972556 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925879A1] Process for association of additives such as flavours, essences, extracts, essential oils to natural sweeteners like saccharose and artificial sweeteners, especially in individual portions in the form of lumps (15) or powder, packaging with a double twist or in packets whose shapes, colours and wording correspond to the additive (16) used to give flavour, aroma, colour, energy, vitamins, mineral salts to beverages in general as a result of their being sweetened at the moment of consumption.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C13F 3/00; C13F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/07 (2006.01); A23L 2/00 (2006.01); A23L 2/39 (2006.01); A23L 2/395 (2006.01); A23L 2/60 (2006.01); A23L 27/00 (2016.01); A23L 27/30 (2016.01); B67D 1/08 (2006.01); C12G 3/06 (2006.01); C13B 50/00 (2011.01); C13B 50/02 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 50/002 (2013.01); A23L 2/39 (2013.01); A23L 2/395 (2013.01); A23L 2/60 (2013.01); A23L 27/72 (2016.08); C12G 3/06 (2013.01); C13B 50/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925879 A1 19990527; AU 5135398 A 19990607; BR 9714984 A 20011204; CA 2307501 A1 19990527; EP 1032712 A1 20000906; IT MI972556 A1 19990518; JP 2001523473 A 20011127; TR 200001462 T2 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [R18R] REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-06-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE