Global Patent Index - EP 1032719 A2

EP 1032719 A2 2000-09-06 - AMORPHOUS NON-LAMINAR NICKEL AND/OR COBALT PHOSPHOROUS ALLOYS, THEIR PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE AND USES

Title (en)

AMORPHOUS NON-LAMINAR NICKEL AND/OR COBALT PHOSPHOROUS ALLOYS, THEIR PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE AND USES

Title (de)

NICHT-LAMINARE AMORPHE NICKEL- UND/ODER COBALTLEGIERUNG MIT PHOSPHOR, IHRE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGES DE NI-P ET/OU CO-P AMORPHES NON LAMINAIRES, LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1032719 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98955023 A

Priority

  • US 9822221 W
  • US 95306597 A
  • US 9963398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920807A2] The present invention provides amorphous non-laminar nickel phosphorous alloys, amorphous non-laminar nickel cobalt phosphorous alloys, or amorphous non-laminar cobalt phosphorous alloys. These alloys are useful in the formation of metal articles and metal-coated articles, including high precision devices and molds for plastics. In addition, the alloys of the present invention are useful in repairing damaged metal surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 45/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920807A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920807 A2 19990429; WO 9920807 A3 19990708; AU 1192399 A 19990510; CA 2306819 A1 19990429; CA 2306819 C 20130122; DE 69811718 D1 20030403; DE 69811718 T2 20040115; EP 1032719 A2 20000906; EP 1032719 B1 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131020

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131020

2014-07-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69811718

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131020

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69811718

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-01-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811718 P 20030403

2003-04-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT