Global Patent Index - EP 1032761 A1

EP 1032761 A1 2000-09-06 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH INTEGRATED SPARK PLUG

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH INTEGRATED SPARK PLUG

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL MIT INTEGRIERTER ZÜNDKERZE

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT A BOUGIE INTEGREE

Publication

EP 1032761 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922069 A

Priority

  • DE 9900861 W
  • DE 19828848 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828848A1] A fuel injection valve has an integrated spark plug (1) for direct injection of fuel into a combustion chamber of an IC engine and to ignite the fuel injected into the combustion chamber. There is: a valve body (7) which forms a sealing seat together with a valve closing body (10) that can be operated by a valve needle (9); an insulating body (6) radially surrounding the valve body and the valve needle at least partly; and a housing body (2) radially surrounding the insulating body at least partly. At least one ignition electrode (15,16) is provided on the valve body and/or the housing body. The valve needle has a first metal guide section guided in the valve body, a second metal guide section guided in the insulating body and an insulating section located between the guide sections. The guide sections are connected in positive locking fashion with the insulating section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/06; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 57/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/166 (2013.01); F02M 57/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000737A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828848 A1 19991230; EP 1032761 A1 20000906; EP 1032761 B1 20040929; JP 2002519570 A 20020702; US 6340015 B1 20020122; WO 0000737 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100324

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910651 P 20041104

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT