Global Patent Index - EP 1032762 A1

EP 1032762 A1 2000-09-06 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH INTEGRATED SPARK PLUG

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH INTEGRATED SPARK PLUG

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL MIT INTEGRIERTER ZÜNDKERZE

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT A BOUGIE INTEGREE

Publication

EP 1032762 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924738 A

Priority

  • DE 9900984 W
  • DE 19828849 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828849A1] A fuel injection valve has an integrated spark plug (1) for direct injection of fuel into a combustion chamber of an IC engine and to ignite the fuel injected into the combustion chamber. There is a valve body (7) which forms a sealing seat together with a valve closing body (10) which at least one outlet opening (12) adjoins at an end face of the valve body facing the combustion chamber. There is a housing body (2) insulated from the valve body. At least one ignition electrode (70) is provided on the housing body in order to generate a spark discharge between the valve body and the ignition electrode. The ignition electrode and the valve body are shaped so that the spark discharge takes place between the end face of the valve body facing the combustion chamber and the ignition electrode. The end face of the valve body facing the combustion chamber and/or the ignition electrode has/have an edge (74-92) near the outlet opening in order to fix the position of the spark discharge at the end face of the valve body in reproducible fashion relative to the position of the outlet opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 57/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 57/06 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 61/163 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828849 A1 19991230; DE 59913266 D1 20060518; EP 1032762 A1 20000906; EP 1032762 B1 20040331; EP 1431571 A2 20040623; EP 1431571 A3 20040804; EP 1431571 B1 20060329; JP 2002519571 A 20020702; US 2003111042 A1 20030619; US 6536405 B1 20030325; US 6748918 B2 20040615; WO 0000738 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909032 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT