Global Patent Index - EP 1032763 A4

EP 1032763 A4 2000-11-15 - PYRAMIDAL MACHINE

Title (en)

PYRAMIDAL MACHINE

Title (de)

PYRAMIDENMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE PYRAMIDALE

Publication

EP 1032763 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98938844 A

Priority

  • EG 88497 A
  • IB 9801330 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911925A1] An energy conversion machine (1) having a pyramidal shape (7) is disclosed. Wind and water energy is utilized by the conversion machine (1) for water desalination and purification, heating, cooling or as an underwater life support system. The pyramidal machine (1) does not cause audio or noise pollution, air pollution or in effect, the environment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03B 13/10; F03B 13/00; F03B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03B 13/00 (2006.01); F03B 13/10 (2006.01); F03B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03B 13/00 (2013.01); F03B 13/10 (2013.01); F03B 13/12 (2013.01); F05B 2250/21 (2013.01); Y02E 10/20 (2013.01); Y02E 10/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 3407881 A1 19850912 - KRIEB FRANZ KARL
  • [T] DATABASE COMPENDEX [online] ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US; SAYED ZEINAB ET AL: "New design of solar water heater", XP002148077, Database accession no. EIX98444366692 & PROC INDIAN ACAD SCI CHEM SCI;PROCEEDINGS OF THE INDIAN ACADEMY OF SCIENCES: CHEMICAL SCIENCES JUN 1998 INDIAN ACAD SCI, BANGALORE, INDIA, vol. 110, no. 3, June 1998 (1998-06-01), pages 373 - 384PROC INDIAN ACAD SCI CHEM SCI;PROCEEDINGS OF THE INDIAN ACADEMY OF SCIENCES: CHEMICAL SCIENCES JUN 1998 INDIAN ACAD SCI, BANGALORE, INDIA1998061103373384
  • [T] HAMDAN M A ET AL: "Performance of solar still under Jordanian climate", ENERGY CONVERSION AND MANAGEMENT,GB,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, OXFORD, vol. 40, no. 5, 1 March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 495 - 503, XP004143661, ISSN: 0196-8904
  • See also references of WO 9911925A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911925 A1 19990311; AU 8743898 A 19990322; CA 2307893 A1 19990311; EP 1032763 A1 20000906; EP 1032763 A4 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-11-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990824