Global Patent Index - EP 1032777 A1

EP 1032777 A1 2000-09-06 - TWO-CHAMBER ENGINE MOUNTING WITH HYDRAULIC DAMPING

Title (en)

TWO-CHAMBER ENGINE MOUNTING WITH HYDRAULIC DAMPING

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCH DÄMPFENDES ZWEIKAMMER-MOTORLAGER

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE MOTEUR A DEUX CHAMBRES A AMORTISSEMENT HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1032777 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961215 A

Priority

  • DE 19751783 A
  • EP 9807377 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19751783A1] The invention relates to a two-chamber engine mounting which provides hydraulic damping. Said engine mounting has a working chamber (1) and a compensating chamber (2) which are filled with a hydraulic fluid. The chambers (1, 2) are separated by an intermediate plate (6, 7) in which an overflow channel (4), at least one switchable bypass channel (18, 19) and a decoupling membrane (3) are located. The decoupling membrane (3) can be turned by means of an actuator (25), said decoupling membrane closing off the bypass channel (18, 19) in a first turn position (47) and opening up the bypass channel (18, 19) in a second turn position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16F 13/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16F 13/26 (2006.01); F16F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16F 13/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927277A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751783 A1 19990602; DE 19751783 C2 20000706; EP 1032777 A1 20000906; EP 1032777 B1 20011004; ES 2163902 T3 20020201; JP 2001524650 A 20011204; US 6357730 B1 20020319; WO 9927277 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031118

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031117

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-11-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-11-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031117

2002-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021118

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163902 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801667 20011108

2001-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRELLEBORG AUTOMOTIVE TECHNICAL CENTRE GMBH

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB