Global Patent Index - EP 1032872 A1

EP 1032872 A1 2000-09-06 - USER INTERFACE

Title (en)

USER INTERFACE

Title (de)

BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE

Title (fr)

INTERFACE UTILISATEUR

Publication

EP 1032872 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954602 A

Priority

  • EP 98954602 A
  • EP 98306261 A
  • GB 9803441 W
  • GB 9724277 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926126A1] A gaze tracker for a multimodal user interface uses a standard videoconferencing set on a workstation to determine where a user is looking on a screen. The gaze tracker uses the video camera (100) to make a quantised image of the user's eye. The pupil is detected in the quantised image and a neural net (125) is used in training the gaze tracker to detect gaze direction. A pre-processor (115) may be used to improve the input to the neural net. A Bayesian net (140) is used to learn the relationship between response time and accuracy for the output of the neural net so that a user's externally set preference can be accommodated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 3/113 (2006.01); G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/01 (2006.01); G06K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/013 (2013.01); A61B 3/113 (2013.01); G06K 9/00268 (2013.01); G06K 9/0061 (2013.01); G06K 9/6273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926126 A1 19990527; AU 1165799 A 19990607; EP 1032872 A1 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-01-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USER INTERFACE FOR A SOFTWARE SYSTEM MONITORING THE EYES OF A USER

2002-01-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USER INTERFACE FOR A SOFTWARE SYSTEM MONITORING THE EYES OF A USER

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB